SB261
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 17, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Hardy

Makes various changes relating to the reorganization or combination and reorganization of certain fire protection districts. (BDR 42-836)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 21, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 15, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 342   

Bill History

Mar 17, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 18, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 342.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)