SB269
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 18, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Makes various changes concerning elections. (BDR 24-840)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 1, Nays: 20.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 07, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 1,   Nay 20,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 367     Amend. No. 523   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 21, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 367 and 523.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time.
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 1, Nays: 20.)