AB316
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodbury, Ohrenschall, Carrillo, Sherwood, Carlton, Bobzien, Conklin, Daly, Diaz, Ellison, Flores, Grady, Hambrick, Hammond, Hansen, Hardy, Horne, Kirkpatrick, Livermore, Mastroluca, McArthur, Munford, Oceguera, Pierce, Smith, Stewart, Leslie, Kieckhefer, Hardy, Manendo, Schneider, Breeden, Cegavske, Copening, Gustavson, Halseth, Horsford, Kihuen, Parks, Rhoads, Settelmeyer

Revises provisions relating to services for persons with autism spectrum disorders. (BDR 38-260)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 30, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended and rerefer
  Senate Finance     May 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 386     Amend. No. 863   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 21, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 386.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 863.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 451.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.