AB322
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 18, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith, Oceguera, Bobzien, Conklin, Goicoechea

Revises provisions relating to wildlife. (BDR 45-150)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 10, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, not agendized
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 24, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 31, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Natural Resources     May 11, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     May 13, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     May 20, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 08, 2011   Yea 35,   Nay 6,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 714   

Bill History

Mar 18, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 21, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 01, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 08, 2011

Apr 11, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 29, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 714.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 714 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 295.
  • Sections 1, 2, 4, and 5 of this act effective June 10, 2011, and section 3 of this act effective July 1, 2011.