SB279
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson, Cegavske, Denis, Halseth, Hardy, Kieckhefer, Lee, McGinness, Rhoads, Roberson, Settelmeyer, Sherwood, Hansen, Aizley, Daly, Goicoechea, Grady, Hambrick, Hammond, Hickey, Horne, Kirner, Kite, McArthur

Revises provisions concerning the renewal of permits to carry concealed firearms. (BDR 15-1060)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 30, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 01, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 14, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 22, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2011

Apr 15, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)