SB282
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Gustavson, Cegavske, Denis, Halseth, Kieckhefer, McGinness, Roberson, Settelmeyer, Sherwood, Aizley, Ellison, Goicoechea, Grady, Hambrick, Hammond, Hansen, Hickey, Kirner, Kite, McArthur

Prohibits the willful and intentional public posting or displaying of the social security number of another person. (BDR 15-792)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 28, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 26, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 06, 2011     12:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 31, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 548   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 22, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 29, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Mar 30, 2011

  • Read second time.

Mar 31, 2011

Apr 01, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 548.) To printer.

May 29, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 548 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.