AB328
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Benitez-Thompson

Enacts provisions relating to vulnerable highway users. (BDR 43-844)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 294.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 05, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 12, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 05, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 251     Amend. No. 675   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 251.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 29, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 675.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 01, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 675 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 294.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.