SB286
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Rhoads, Smith

Revises provisions governing the Merit Award Program. (BDR 31-980)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 66.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 05, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 03, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 10, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 368   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 368.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 10, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.
  • Action of placement on General File for next legislative day rescinded.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 11, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 19, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 66.
  • Effective May 19, 2011, for the purpose of adopting the form described in section 15, and October 1, 2011, for all other purposes.