AB330
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Makes various changes to provisions relating to certain government contracts. (BDR 19-965)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 06, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     Jun 01, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Jun 03, 2011     09:45 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 246   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 246.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.

May 26, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Read second time.

Jun 05, 2011

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 452.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.