AB331
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin, Kirkpatrick, Smith, Bustamante Adams

Makes various changes concerning the use of consumer reports. (BDR 52-831)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 04, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 06, 2011     01:00 PM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 30,   Nay 8,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 981   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 880   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 981   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 880.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 8, Excused: 4.)
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)