AB332
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin, Kirkpatrick, Smith

Makes various changes relating to the Economic Forum. (BDR 31-307)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 491.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 12, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 05, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     Jun 06, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 15,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 784   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 29, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 784.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 491.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.