AB339
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ellison, Goicoechea, Grady

Requires certain substances known as synthetic marijuana to be included on the list of schedule I controlled substances. (BDR 40-546)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 09, 2011     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 26, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)