AB345
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall, Conklin, Carlton, Oceguera, Woodbury, Aizley, Anderson, Atkinson, Benitez-Thompson, Bobzien, Bustamante Adams, Carrillo, Daly, Diaz, Dondero Loop, Flores, Frierson, Hogan, Horne, Kirkpatrick, Livermore, Mastroluca, Munford, Neal, Pierce, Segerblom, Smith, Stewart, Schneider, Leslie, Horsford, Lee, Rhoads, Breeden, Hardy, Kieckhefer, Kihuen, Manendo, Parks, Wiener

Revises provisions relating to services for persons with autism spectrum disorders. (BDR 38-26)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 450.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 30, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and rerefer
  Senate Finance     May 06, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 09, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 864   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 864.) To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 450.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.