SB290
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Copening

Revises provisions governing deceptive trade practices. (BDR 52-993)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 06, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amendment proposed, failed

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)