SB292
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Revises provisions relating to insurance. (BDR 57-1074)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 356.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 25, 2011     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 16, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 30,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 272     Amend. No. 655   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 272.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 655.) To printer.

May 26, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

May 29, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 655 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 356.
  • Effective June 13, 2011, for the purposes of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and October 1, 2011, for all other purposes.