SB293
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske

Makes various changes relating to certain nonprofit organizations. (BDR 3-1011)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 367.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 23, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rerefer
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 402   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 24, 2011

  • From committee: Rerefer to Committee on Judiciary.
  • Action of rereferral rescinded.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 402.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 367.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.