SB294
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske, Leslie

Establishes provisions governing providers of health care. (BDR 40-16)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 430.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 214     Amend. No. 452     Amend. No. 815     Amend. No. CA22   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 214 and 452.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 25, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 815.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

May 31, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 815 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 815 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 05, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.
  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 815 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To printer.

Jun 08, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 430.
  • Effective June 16, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and January 1, 2012, for all other purposes.