SB298
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness

Enacts provisions governing noxious odors. (BDR 40-1077)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 25, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)