SB301
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Settelmeyer

Makes various changes to provisions governing dairy products and dairy substitutes. (BDR 51-702)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 31, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 02, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 18, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 07, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Read second time.

Apr 07, 2011

Apr 08, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 19, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

May 30, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.4, no further action allowed.)