SB302
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Prohibits the sale of black powder and smokeless gunpowder to certain persons. (BDR 42-981)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 106.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Transportation     Apr 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 10, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 16, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 400   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 400.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 17, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2011

May 19, 2011

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 20, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 24, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 106.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.