SB303
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
McGinness

Revises provisions governing the issuance of special license plates, special parking placards and special parking stickers to persons with a permanent disability. (BDR 43-1100)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)