AB351
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Carlton

Revises provisions governing certain motor carriers. (BDR 58-1049)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 526.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 10, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 05, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 17,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 288     Amend. No. 737     Amend. No. 971   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 288.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 30, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 737.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 971.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 17, Nays: 4.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 737 and 971 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 526.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.