AB357
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea, Grady, Rhoads, Settelmeyer

Limits the use of certain property or the proceeds of certain property by the Board of Regents of the University of Nevada. (BDR 34-1065)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Education     Apr 13, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Education     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)