AB359
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Goicoechea, Grady, Settelmeyer

Revises provisions governing energy. (BDR 58-1064)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 11, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 17, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 24, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 01, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 436   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 875   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 436   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 436.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective.
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

May 25, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 40, Nays: 2.) To Senate.

May 26, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 875.) To printer.

Jun 04, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 875 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 347.
  • Sections 9, 10, 11, and 12 of this act effective June 13, 2011. Sections 1 to 8.5, inclusive, of this act effective July 1, 2011. Sections 1 and 2 of this act expire by limitation June 30, 2016.