AB360
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Bobzien

Revises provisions governing city or county ordinances regarding the abatement of certain conditions and nuisances on property within the city or county. (BDR 21-266)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 261     Amend. No. 748   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 261.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 23, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 25, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 748.) To printer.

May 26, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 27, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 748 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 492.
  • Effective June 17, 2011.