AB362
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Diaz, Carrillo, Frierson, Dondero Loop, Sherwood, Aizley, Atkinson, Benitez-Thompson, Bobzien, Bustamante Adams, Daly, Flores, Horne, Kirkpatrick, Neal, Ohrenschall, Pierce, Segerblom, Smith

Revises provisions governing certain programs that supervise children. (BDR 38-782)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 08, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 26, 2011     03:05 PM          Minutes          Do not recede

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 481     Amend. No. 610     Amend. No. CA1   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 481.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 18, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 610.) To printer.

May 20, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 610 not concurred in. To Senate.

May 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

May 27, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 610 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 28, 2011

  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly.
  • To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 610 and further amend. Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.
  • Effective July 1, 2011. Section 17 of this act expires by limitation June 30, 2013.