AB363
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ellison

Revises provisions governing manufactured housing. (BDR 43-996)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 30, 2011     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 29, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Apr 30, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 06, 2011   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 282   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 282   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 282.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective.
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

May 02, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

May 06, 2011

May 07, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)