SB313
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Schneider

Revises certain provisions relating to energy. (BDR 58-236)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 13, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 10,   Nay 11,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 302     Amend. No. 954   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 302.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 954.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Lost. (Yeas: 10, Nays: 11.)