SJR9
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee

Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require an affirmative vote of two-thirds of the members elected to each House of the Legislature to decrease revenues or reserves of or mandate that new or different services be performed by a local government. (BDR C-395)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 07, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 08, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 17, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 22, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 08, 2011

  • EXEMPT, Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule 14.6.4(a).

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)