AB374
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Woodbury, Atkinson, Daly, Hammond

Revises provisions governing the purchase of certain mobile equipment by the Department of Transportation. (BDR 35-852)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Transportation     Mar 31, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 14, 2011     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Transportation     May 03, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Transportation     May 10, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Transportation     May 19, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 317     Amend. No. 499     Amend. No. 676   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 317.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 25, 2011

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 499.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 29, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 676.) To printer.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 676 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 02, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 292.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.