AB376
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Smith, Bobzien, Kirkpatrick, Conklin, Hogan, Oceguera, Leslie

Makes various changes regarding local governmental administration. (BDR 21-148)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 505.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Government Affairs     May 09, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 18, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Taxation     Jun 03, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 395     Amend. No. 632   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. CA23   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 395.) To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

Apr 27, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 28, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 632.) To printer.

May 29, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

May 31, 2011

  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 632 not concurred in. To Senate.
  • In Senate.

Jun 04, 2011

  • Senate Amendment No. 632 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

Jun 05, 2011

  • Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Concur in Senate Amendment No. 632 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • To printer.

Jun 08, 2011

Jun 09, 2011

  • To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 505.
  • Sections 1, 7, 12, 15, 16, and 17 of this act effective June 17, 2011. Sections 2 to 6, inclusive, 8 to 11, inclusive, 13, and 14 of this act effective July 1, 2011. The authorization to impose a surcharge pursuant to NRS 244A.830, as amended by section 10 of this act, expires by limitation on June 30 of the later of the fiscal year that is 20 years after the fiscal year in which the ordinance imposing the surcharge is adopted or the fiscal year in which all bonds issued pursuant to NRS 268.526 and 279.636, as amended by sections 2 and 11 of this act, including, without limitation, any bonds issued to refund bonds issued pursuant to those sections, respectively, are fully paid as to all principal, interest, and any other amounts due.