AB380
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Conklin, Kirkpatrick, Atkinson, Oceguera, Smith

Revises provisions governing certain programs for renewable energy systems. (BDR 58-308)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 412.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 23, 2011     04:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 15, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 17, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 435     Amend. No. 862   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 435.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 862.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Chapter 412.
  • Sections 1, 3 to 42, inclusive, 44, 45, 46, 48 to 51, inclusive, subsection 2 of section 52, and sections 53 and 54 of this act effective June 15, 2011. Sections 2, 43, 47, and subsection 1 of section 52 of this act effective January 1, 2022.