AB383
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hickey, Goicoechea, Grady, Kirner

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning trademark and copyright law. (BDR S-983)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 461.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 05, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 02, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 03, 2011   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 06, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 03, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 461.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.