SB338
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden, Wiener

Revises provisions relating to reports of certain medical and related facilities. (BDR 40-261)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 28, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized   Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2011     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 03, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 329     Amend. No. 849   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 329.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 849.) To printer.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Jun 04, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 7.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.
  • Effective June 14, 2011, for purposes of adopting regulations and January 1, 2012, for all other purposes.