SB339
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden, Wiener

Establishes provisions relating to the safety of patients in certain medical facilities. (BDR 40-662)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 28, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized   Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2011     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 11, 2011     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 20, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 26, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 28, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 526     Amend. No. 711   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 526.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 711.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 28, 2011

Jun 01, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 711 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 03, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 10, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 279.
  • Effective June 10, 2011, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out this act, and for all other purposes: Sections 1 and 2.5 effective October 1, 2011; Sections 2 and 4 to 7, inclusive, effective January 1, 2012; Section 3 effective January 1, 2012, except that, for the purpose of the continuing education required by that section for infection control officers, effective January 1, 2013.