SB340
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Breeden, Wiener

Revises provisions relating to programs to increase public awareness of health care information. (BDR 40-663)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 442.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 28, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized   Assigned to Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 04, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2011     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 14, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 29, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Jun 04, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Jun 05, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 02, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 327     Amend. No. 962   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 327.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance.
  • To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 01, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass, as amended.

Jun 02, 2011

Jun 03, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 962.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 34, Nays: 8.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 962 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 442.
  • Effective October 1, 2011.