AB396
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Diaz, Conklin, Kirkpatrick, Segerblom, Aizley, Atkinson, Benitez-Thompson, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Daly, Dondero Loop, Flores, Frierson, Mastroluca, Neal, Oceguera, Pierce, Smith

Revises provisions relating to industrial insurance involving certain employees who are injured during certain cooperative governmental activities. (BDR 53-1002)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 169.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 13, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 13, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 257   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 257.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 14, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2011

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2011

May 25, 2011

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 27, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 169.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.