AB400
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy, Hambrick, Hardy

Revises provisions relating to town advisory boards. (BDR 21-818)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 28, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 13, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 396   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 22, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 396.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • In Senate.

Apr 27, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)