AB403
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Requires the adoption of certain permanent regulations. (BDR S-974)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 06, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 15, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 27, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     May 11, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 20, 2011   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

Apr 22, 2011

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)