AB405
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Revises provisions governing the Public Employees’ Retirement System. (BDR S-964)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 527.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 13, 2011     07:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 04, 2011     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 955   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 955.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 527.
  • Effective June 17, 2011.