SB359
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Horsford, Denis, Kihuen, Leslie, Parks, Flores, Frierson, Brooks, Atkinson, Bustamante Adams, Horne, Neal

Revises provisions relating to contracts with a governmental entity. (BDR 23-973)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Mar 24, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Mar 25, 2011     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Finance     Apr 01, 2011     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Finance     Apr 11, 2011     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Finance     May 23, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed in Subcommittee
  Senate Finance     May 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned, no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 27, 2011   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 791   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of exemption.

May 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 791.) To printer.

May 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)