AB427
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Ohrenschall

Directs the Legislative Commission to conduct an interim study concerning the establishment of a program requiring the payment of deposits and refunds on recyclable products sold in this State. (BDR S-1079)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 462.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 05, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Apr 14, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 03, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Jun 06, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2011   Yea 30,   Nay 12,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 06, 2011   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 297     Amend. No. 917   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 297.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

Apr 21, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 05, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 917.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 30, Nays: 12.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • From committee: Do pass. Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Jun 16, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Chapter 462.
  • Effective July 1, 2011.