AB428
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Pierce

Revises formula for determining tax on net proceeds of minerals extracted. (BDR 32-883)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Waiver granted effective: April 14, 2011.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)