SB367
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske, Hardy

Requires certain health care practitioners to communicate certain information to the public. (BDR 54-625)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 11, 2011     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 09, 2011     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 215   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 20, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 215.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2011

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 21, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)