AB436
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Oceguera

Provides a deduction from the payroll tax for wages paid to newly hired employees under certain circumstances. (BDR 32-724)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 05, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)