SB373
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Roberson

Requires photographic identification for voting. (BDR 24-778)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 12, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Without recommendation and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Without recommendation and rerefer to the Committee on Finance.
  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)