SB376
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske, Breeden, Brower, Gustavson, Halseth, Hardy, Kihuen, Lee, Manendo, McGinness, Parks, Rhoads, Roberson, Schneider, Settelmeyer

Increases the penalty for certain technological crimes. (BDR 15-1000)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 524.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 25, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 07, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 29, 2011     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 19, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Judiciary     May 20, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 06, 2011     12:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 22, 2011   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 30, 2011   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 164     Amend. No. 732   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 14, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 164.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 22, 2011

Apr 25, 2011

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 27, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 732.) To printer.

May 28, 2011

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2011

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2011

Jun 02, 2011

  • In Senate.

Jun 06, 2011

  • Assembly Amendment No. 732 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2011

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 17, 2011

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 524.
  • Effective June 17, 2011.