SB379
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Kieckhefer

Revises provisions governing the inspection by the Health Division of the Department of Health and Human Services of certain facilities and offices regulated by the Health Division. (BDR 40-1012)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 11, 2011     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 216   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 25, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 26, 2011

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 216.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 07, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)