AB442
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Brooks, Atkinson, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Daly, Ellison, Frierson, Hickey, Horne, Kirkpatrick, Oceguera, Pierce, Lee, Manendo

Establishes the Community Solar Garden Demonstration Program. (BDR 58-1082)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 30, 2011     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          No action

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 16, 2011

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)