AB443
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 21, 2011.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Brooks, Benitez-Thompson, Bustamante Adams, Ellison, Hickey, Kirkpatrick, Oceguera, Sherwood, Denis, Lee, Manendo

Provides a deduction from the payroll tax for wages paid to newly hired full-time employees under certain circumstances. (BDR 32-711)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Mar 31, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          No action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 14, 2011     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 311   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 311   

Bill History

Mar 21, 2011

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 23, 2011

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2011

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 26, 2011

  • From committee: Amend, without recommendation, and rerefer to Committee on Ways and Means.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 311.)
  • Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective.
  • To printer.

Apr 27, 2011

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To committee.

Jun 06, 2011

  • (No further action taken.)